ME LD1663 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve the Regulation of Debt Collectors
Title
An Act To Improve the Regulation of Debt Collectors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-02-01 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-01 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-01-30 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-01-30 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2018-01-30 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-01-30 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on November 27, 2017 and REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |