ME LD1663 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-11 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-11 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Promote Recruitment and Retention of State Employees
Title
An Act To Promote Recruitment and Retention of State Employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-08 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #571 (Y: 77 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #610 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #610 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2016-04-11 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-11 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of the Minority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-469) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-478) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-04-08 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-08 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2016-04-08 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 571 (Yeas 77 - Nays 68 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2016-04-08 | House | On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reports READ. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-04-06 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-469) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-478) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland Senate Amendment "A" (S-478) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-469) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-04-06 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 610 Yeas 20 - Nays 15 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2016-04-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset the Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reports READ |
2016-03-22 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-22 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator Whittemore of Somerset REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-03-17 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |