ME LD1663 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Secretary of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Secretary of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Require New Contracts for MaineCare Nonemergency Transportation
Title
Resolve, To Require New Contracts for MaineCare Nonemergency Transportation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #580 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-27 - House - Adopt Hah-754 To Cas-441 RC #589 (Y: 82 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #560 (Y: 86 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #480 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - Adopt Hah-754 To Cas-441 RC #589 (Y: 82 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #560 (Y: 86 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #480 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Senate | Secretary of the Senate |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Darek M. Grant |
2014-04-15 | Senate | ____________________ |
2014-04-15 | Senate | LD 1663 In Senate, April 15, 2014, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 20 in the Affirmative and 15 in the Negative , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2014-04-01 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-01 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-441) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-754) thereto , in concurrence. |
2014-03-27 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-27 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2014-03-27 | House | Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-441) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-754) thereto |
2014-03-27 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-441) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-754) thereto ADOPTED. |
2014-03-27 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 589 (Yeas 82 - Nays 55 - Absent 14 - Excused 0) |
2014-03-27 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, House Amendment "A" (H-754) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-441) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-03-27 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, under FURTHER suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-441). |
2014-03-27 | House | On motion of Representative FARNSWORTH of Portland, under suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-441). |
2014-03-27 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2014-03-27 | House | Later today assigned. |
2014-03-27 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-03-25 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-25 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-441). |
2014-03-25 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2014-03-25 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-441) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-03-25 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2014-03-25 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 560 (Yeas 86 - Nays 56 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2014-03-25 | House | On motion of Representative FARNSWORTH of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-25 | House | Reports READ. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-441) |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-441) READ and ADOPTED |
2014-03-24 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 480 21 Yeas - 14 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Subsequently, Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2014-03-24 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-21 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending her motion to accept the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senator CRAVEN of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT Majority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Reports READ |
2013-12-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 23, 2013 and REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |