ME LD1663 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-12 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-12 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Correct Errors in Recently Enacted Laws Governing Agency Liquor Stores
Title
An Act To Correct Errors in Recently Enacted Laws Governing Agency Liquor Stores
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-03-06 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-06 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-395) | |
2012-03-06 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2012-03-01 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2012-02-29 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-02-29 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-395). | |
2012-02-29 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2012-02-28 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2012-02-28 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-395) READ and ADOPTED. | |
2012-02-28 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-02-28 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2012-01-04 | (S) Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 19, 2011 and REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |