ME LD166 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Sent to the Engrossing Department.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Sent to the Engrossing Department.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase Reimbursement for Child Care Services
Title
An Act To Increase Reimbursement for Child Care Services
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Libby [D] | Rep. James Handy [D] | Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] | Sen. Roger Katz [R] |
Rep. Paul Chace [R] | Rep. Colleen Madigan [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #659 (Y: 119 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #659 (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #595 (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - Adopt Sas-423 To Cas-407 RC #575 (Y: 60 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Adopt Sas-423 To Cas-407 RC #588 (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #583 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #659 (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #595 (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - Adopt Sas-423 To Cas-407 RC #575 (Y: 60 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Adopt Sas-423 To Cas-407 RC #588 (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #583 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | House | Sent to the Engrossing Department. |
2018-05-02 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-05-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 659V 119 having voted in the affirmative and 29 in the negative, with 3 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2018-05-02 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2018-05-02 | Senate | LD 166 In Senate, May 2, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 31 IN FAVOR and 3 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-04-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 595 Yeas 25 - Nays 6 - Excused 4 - Absent 0 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-407) in concurrence |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin moved The Senate INSIST |
2018-04-05 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-05 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2018-04-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-407). |
2018-04-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2018-04-05 | House | Subsequently, Committee Amendment "A" (S-407) was ADOPTED. |
2018-04-05 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 575 (Yeas 60 - Nays 83 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2018-04-05 | House | Senate Amendment "A" (S-423) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-407) was READ and FAILED ADOPTION. |
2018-04-05 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-407) was READ. |
2018-04-05 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2018-04-05 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-04-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-407) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-423) thereto |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-407) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-423) thereto ADOPTED |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Roll Call Number 588 Yeas 18 - Nays 14 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Subsequently Senate Amendment "A" (S-423) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-407) ADOPTED |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin to ADOPT Senate Amendment "A" (S-423) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-407) Roll Call Ordered |
2018-04-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin Senate Amendment "A" (S-423) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-407) READ and ADOPTED |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-407) READ |
2018-04-03 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 583 Yeas 35 - Nays 0 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-407) Report ACCEPTED |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-08-02 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-01-19 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-19 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |