ME LD166 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-15 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-15 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow Counties To Better Provide Rescue Services
Title
An Act To Allow Counties To Better Provide Rescue Services
Sponsors
Rep. Roberta Beavers [D] | Sen. David Dutremble [D] | Rep. David Woodsome [R] | Rep. Christopher Babbidge [D] |
Rep. Mark Eves [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2016-03-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator COLLINS of York The Senate INSISTED To INDEFINITE POSTPONEMENT of Bill and accompanying papers In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-03-10 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-10 | House | Subsequently, the House INSISTED on PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-513) and ASKED for a COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE. |
2016-03-10 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2016-03-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-03 | House | Later today assigned. |
2016-03-03 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-03-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "B" (H-513) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME |
2016-02-23 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "B" (H-513) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED , in concurrence. |
2016-02-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-02-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-513). |
2016-02-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2016-02-16 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2016-02-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence |
2015-06-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With Bill and accompanying papers COMMITTED to the Committee on State and Local Government , in concurrence. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION |
2015-05-28 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-28 | House | Subsequently, the House INSISTED on COMMITTING the Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2015-05-28 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2015-05-27 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-26 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-21 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-05-21 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Reports READ |
2015-05-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-14 | House | On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair the Bill and accompanying papers were COMMITTED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2015-05-14 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2015-05-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-13 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-05-13 | House | On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2015-05-13 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on State and Local Government, in concurrence. |
2015-01-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-01-29 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |