ME LD1656 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow Veterans Free Admission to the Maine State Museum
Title
An Act To Allow Veterans Free Admission to the Maine State Museum
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-09 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #604 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #571 (Y: 111 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-a RC #528 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #571 (Y: 111 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-a RC #528 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | in concurrence |
2018-04-09 | Senate | LD 1656 In Senate, April 9, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 33 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2018-04-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-05 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 571V 111 having voted in the affirmative and 34 in the negative, with 6 being absent, and 0 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2018-04-05 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2018-04-05 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2018-04-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-02 | House | Later today assigned. |
2018-04-02 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast the Bill was TABLED pending RECONSIDERATION. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-15 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-606) in concurrence |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-606) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2018-03-06 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 528 Yeas 34 - Nays 0 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Subsequently On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-606) ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF ANY REPORT |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reports READ |
2018-02-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-27 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-606). |
2018-02-27 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-606) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-02-27 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2018-02-27 | House | On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. |
2018-02-27 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-11-29 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2017-11-29 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on November 27, 2017. |