ME LD1655 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create a Sales Tax Exemption for the Sale and Delivery of Off-peak Electricity for Electric Thermal Storage Devices
Title
An Act To Create a Sales Tax Exemption for the Sale and Delivery of Off-peak Electricity for Electric Thermal Storage Devices
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Alfond [D] | Rep. Seth Berry [D] | Sen. Jonathan Courtney [R] | Rep. Robert Harmon [R] |
Sen. David Hastings [R] | Rep. Barry Hobbins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator ROSEN of Hancock. | |
2012-03-06 | (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-01 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-02-29 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-02-29 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-383) | |
2012-02-29 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2012-02-29 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2012-02-28 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2012-02-23 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-02-23 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-383) . | |
2012-02-23 | (S) TAKEN from the Table by the President. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) On motion by Senator ALFOND of Cumberland TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-383). | |
2012-02-22 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME . | |
2012-02-21 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2012-02-21 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-383) READ and ADOPTED. | |
2012-02-21 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-02-21 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2012-01-04 | (S) Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 19, 2011 and REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |