ME LD1653 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 1 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Retirement Benefits for Capitol Police Officers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Retirement Benefits for Capitol Police Officers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #496 (Y: 85 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
2018-03-15SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2018-03-06HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-03-06HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2018-03-01HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-03-01HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-366).
2018-03-01HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2018-03-01HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-366) was READ and ADOPTED.
2018-03-01HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2018-03-01HouseROLL CALL NO. 496 (Yeas 85 - Nays 57 - Absent 9 - Excused 0)
2018-03-01HouseOn motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2018-03-01HouseReports READ.
2018-02-27SenateSent down for concurrence
2018-02-27SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-366)
2018-02-27SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-366) READ and ADOPTED
2018-02-27SenateREAD ONCE
2018-02-27SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-366) Report ACCEPTED
2018-02-27SenateReports READ
2017-11-29SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate on November 27, 2017 and REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback