ME LD1652 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Authorize the Commissioner of Marine Resources To Limit the Number of Shrimp Licenses That May Be Used in Certain Seasons
Title
An Act To Authorize the Commissioner of Marine Resources To Limit the Number of Shrimp Licenses That May Be Used in Certain Seasons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-22 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-03-20 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-20 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-376). |
2018-03-20 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-03-20 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-376) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-376) READ and ADOPTED |
2018-03-15 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on November 27, 2017 and REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |