ME LD1649 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Modernize Maine's Solar Power Policy and Encourage Economic Development
Title
An Act To Modernize Maine's Solar Power Policy and Encourage Economic Development
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-04-29 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #661 (Y: 93 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - House - Reconsider RC #660 (Y: 84 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #650 (Y: 96 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Adopt Sas-522 To Cah-666 RC #672 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Accept Otp-b Rpt RC #671 (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-14 - House - Recede And Concur RC #633 (Y: 91 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amend RC #605 (Y: 81 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - House - Reconsider RC #660 (Y: 84 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #650 (Y: 96 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Adopt Sas-522 To Cah-666 RC #672 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Accept Otp-b Rpt RC #671 (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-14 - House - Recede And Concur RC #633 (Y: 91 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amend RC #605 (Y: 81 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | House | (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.) |
2016-04-29 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 661V 93 having voted in the affirmative and 50 in the negative, with 8 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become law and the veto was sustained. |
2016-04-29 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2016-04-29 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 660 (Yeas 84 - Nays 62 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2016-04-29 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the veto was SUSTAINED. |
2016-04-29 | House | HELD at the Request of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan. |
2016-04-29 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 650V 96 having voted in the affirmative and 52 in the negative, with 3 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2016-04-29 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2016-04-16 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2016-04-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-666) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-522) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-666) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-522) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 672 Yeas 35 - Nays 0 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator WOODSOME of York Senate Amendment "A" (S-522) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-666) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-666) READ |
2016-04-14 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-666) Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 671 Yeas 16 - Nays 19 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin to ACCEPT Report B Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-667) Report FAILED |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Reports READ |
2016-04-14 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-14 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 633 (Yeas 91 - Nays 56 - Absent 4 - Excused 0) |
2016-04-14 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-666) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-522) thereto |
2016-04-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-13 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-666). |
2016-04-13 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2016-04-13 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-666) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2016-04-13 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2016-04-13 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 605 (Yeas 81 - Nays 69 - Absent 1 - Excused 0) |
2016-04-13 | House | On motion of Representative DION of Portland, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. |
2016-04-13 | House | Reports READ. |
2016-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY |
2016-03-10 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2016-03-10 | House | Representative DION for the Joint Standing Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology pursuant to Resolve 2015, chapter 37, section 2 reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |