ME LD1644 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow the City of Saco To Stabilize the Coastline and Coastal Sand Dune System Adjacent to the Saco River
Title
An Act To Allow the City of Saco To Stabilize the Coastline and Coastal Sand Dune System Adjacent to the Saco River
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Valentino [D] | Sen. Justin Chenette [D] | Rep. James Boyle [D] | Sen. Ronald Collins [R] |
Rep. Barry Hobbins [D] | Rep. Megan Rochelo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2014-03-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-03-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-405). |
2014-03-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2014-03-11 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-405) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-03-11 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2014-03-11 | House | On motion of Representative WELSH of Rockport, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-11 | House | Reports READ. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-405). |
2014-03-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-405) READ and ADOPTED |
2014-03-05 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2014-03-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator BOYLE of Cumberland Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2014-03-05 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator BOYLE of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report Committee Amendment "A" (S-405). On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-405) Report. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Reports READ |
2013-12-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 23, 2013 and REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |