ME LD1641 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Examine Issues Relating to the School Transportation Workforce
Title
Resolve, To Examine Issues Relating to the School Transportation Workforce
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Herbig [D] | Rep. Scott Cuddy [D] | Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] | Rep. Janice Dodge [D] |
Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D] | Rep. Rebecca Millett [D] | Rep. Joseph Perry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-05 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-06-04 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-04 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-172). |
2019-06-04 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-04 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-172). |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-172) READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-04-25 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-25 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |