ME LD1632 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Summary
Resolve, Regarding Biofuel in Number 2 Heating Oil
Title
Resolve, Regarding Biofuel in Number 2 Heating Oil
Sponsors
Sen. Philip Bartlett [D] | Rep. Steven Butterfield [D] | Rep. Robert Duchesne [D] | Sen. Seth Goodall [D] |
Rep. Melissa Innes [D] | Rep. Jane Knapp [R] | Rep. Joan Welsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-690) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-541) thereto | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2010-04-07 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-690) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-541) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-690) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-541) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-04-07 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-541) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-690) READ and ADOPTED | |
2010-04-07 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-690) in concurrence | |
2010-04-07 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-690) in concurrence | |
2010-04-07 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE | |
2010-03-22 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence | |
2010-03-18 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-03-16 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-690) in concurrence | |
2010-03-16 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2010-03-11 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2010-03-11 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-690) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2010-03-11 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2010-03-11 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2010-03-11 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-11 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-690) | |
2010-03-11 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2010-03-11 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2010-03-09 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-12-23 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on NATURAL RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. | |
2009-12-23 | (H) Received by the Clerk of the House on December 21, 2009. |