ME LD1628 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Implement Recommendations of the Department of Environmental Protection Regarding the State's Container Redemption Laws
Title
An Act To Implement Recommendations of the Department of Environmental Protection Regarding the State's Container Redemption Laws
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-19 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-19 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-461) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-347) thereto. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-461) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-347) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-461) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-347) thereto ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-347) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-461) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-461) was ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-461) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator SANBORN, L. of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2019-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-06 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-461), in concurrence. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-461) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-461). |
2019-06-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-04-25 | Senate | The Bill and accompanying papers was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2019-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-25 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES |
2019-04-25 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-04-25 | House | Representative TUCKER for the Joint Standing Committee on Environment and Natural Resources pursuant to Joint Order 2019, H.P. 883 reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |