ME LD1628 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Limit Payment for Care and Treatment of Residents of State Institutions
Title
An Act To Limit Payment for Care and Treatment of Residents of State Institutions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator ROSEN of Hancock. | |
2012-03-29 | (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-28 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-468). | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (S-468) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) On motion of Representative STRANG BURGESS of Cumberland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2012-03-26 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-03-26 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-468).. | |
2012-03-26 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-468) READ and ADOPTED. | |
2012-03-26 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-26 | (S) On motion by Senator McCORMICK of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-468) Report ACCEPTED. | |
2012-03-26 | (S) Reports READ. | |
2012-01-04 | (S) Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 16, 2011 and REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |