ME LD1627 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Enhance Behavioral Health Services To Better Protect Maine Residents

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Enhance Behavioral Health Services To Better Protect Maine Residents

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-19SenatePursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2021-05-12JointReported Out: ONTP
2021-05-11JointVoted: ONTP
2021-05-11JointWork Session Held
2021-04-28HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-04-28HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
2021-04-28SenateOn motion by Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin The Bill was REFERENCED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2021-04-28SenateCommittee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback