ME LD1621 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Health and Human Services To Amend Its Rules Governing Reimbursement to Hospitals for Patients Awaiting Placement in Nursing Facilities
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Health and Human Services To Amend Its Rules Governing Reimbursement to Hospitals for Patients Awaiting Placement in Nursing Facilities
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2016-03-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE in concurrence |
2016-03-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-29 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2016-03-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-28 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-433). |
2016-03-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2016-03-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2016-03-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-433) . |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-433) READ and ADOPTED. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2016-03-01 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-01 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2016-03-01 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Reported by Senator BRAKEY for the Health and Human Services pursuant to Joint Order 2015, S.P. 631. |