ME LD162 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Care Provided to Forensic Patients
Title
An Act To Improve Care Provided to Forensic Patients
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Gattine [D] | Sen. Roger Katz [R] | Sen. Catherine Breen [D] | Rep. Scott Hamann [D] |
Rep. Brian Hubbell [D] | Rep. Patricia Hymanson [D] | Rep. Erik Jorgensen [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-08-02 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #442 (Y: 73 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #372 (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-22 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #376 (Y: 78 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #372 (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-22 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #376 (Y: 78 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-02 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2017-08-02 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-08-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 442V 73 having voted in the affirmative and 64 in the negative, with 13 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2017-08-02 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2017-07-20 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-482) READ and ADOPTED Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-482) in concurrence |
2017-06-22 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 372 Yeas 13 - Nays 22 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. FAILED |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-06-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-22 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-482). |
2017-06-22 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-22 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-482) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-22 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-22 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 376 (Yeas 78 - Nays 67 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2017-06-22 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-22 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-13 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-06-13 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2017-06-13 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2017-01-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-19 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2017-01-19 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |