ME LD1618 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Support Maine's Working Families through Universal Child Care
Title
An Act To Support Maine's Working Families through Universal Child Care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-05-24 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-24 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-05-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator DOW of Lincoln The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-18 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2017-05-18 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1618&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1114&item=1&snum=128 |