ME LD1615 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Enact the Peer-to-peer Car Sharing Insurance Act
Title
An Act To Enact the Peer-to-peer Car Sharing Insurance Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-13 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-13 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-540) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-278) thereto. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-540) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-278) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-540) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-278) thereto ADOPTED |
2019-06-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator SANBORN, H. of Cumberland Senate Amendment "B" (S-278) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-540) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-540) READ |
2019-06-13 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator SANBORN, H. of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator SANBORN, H. of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-06-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-540). |
2019-06-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-11 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-540) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-11 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-11 | House | On motion of Representative TEPLER of Topsham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-11 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator Sanborn of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on Health Coverage, Insurance and Financial Services, in concurrence. |
2019-04-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-23 | House | On motion of Representative McLEAN of Gorham, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee on TRANSPORTATION suggested and ordered printed. |