ME LD1615 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Election Laws
Title
An Act To Amend the Election Laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2014-03-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-06 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | AND House Amendment "A" (H-662) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator HASKELL of Cumberland The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-620) |
2014-03-06 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-06 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2014-03-06 | House | Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-620) and House Amendment "A" (H-662). |
2014-03-06 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, House Amendment "A" (H-662) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-03-06 | House | On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, under suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-620). |
2014-03-06 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2014-03-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-04 | House | Later today assigned. |
2014-03-04 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-620), in concurrence. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-620) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-02-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-02-26 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-620) |
2014-02-26 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2014-02-26 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2014-02-26 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-12-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2013-12-30 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 23, 2013. |