ME LD1614 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-17 - (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-17 - (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Summary
An Act To Prohibit the Use of Personal Watercraft on Wilson Pond
Title
An Act To Prohibit the Use of Personal Watercraft on Wilson Pond
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-17 | (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | |
2010-02-17 | (S) On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2010-02-17 | (S) Reports READ | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-02-11 | (H) On motion of Representative CLARK of Millinocket, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2009-12-23 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. | |
2009-12-23 | (H) Received by the Clerk of the House on December 21, 2009. |