ME LD1610 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Privacy of Online Customer Personal Information
Title
An Act To Protect Privacy of Online Customer Personal Information
Sponsors
Sen. Shenna Bellows [D] | Rep. Owen Casas [I] | Sen. Dawn Hill [D] | Rep. David Woodsome [R] |
Rep. Kent Ackley [I] | Rep. Seth Berry [D] | Sen. Stacey Guerin [R] | Rep. Lance Harvell [R] |
Rep. Matthew Moonen [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #628 (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-13 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #601 (Y: 82 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #620 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #601 (Y: 82 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #620 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2018-04-17 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-17 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-453). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Subsequently The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of Minority OUGHT NOT TO PASS Report Accepted |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 628 Yeas 17 - Nays 18 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin moved The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED FAILED |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senator WOODSOME of York moved The Senate INSIST |
2018-04-13 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-13 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2018-04-13 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-453). |
2018-04-13 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2018-04-13 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-453) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-04-13 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2018-04-13 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 601 (Yeas 82 - Nays 63 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2018-04-13 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-04-13 | House | Reports READ. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 620 Yeas 19 - Nays 16 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator WOODSOME of York The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator WOODSOME of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-08-02 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-05-18 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-18 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-05-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator WOODSOME of York The Senate INSISTED on REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-16 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-16 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2017-05-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |