ME LD1607 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prioritize Family Members as Surrogates for Medical Decisions
Title
An Act To Prioritize Family Members as Surrogates for Medical Decisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #275 (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-09 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #286 (Y: 74 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-09 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #286 (Y: 74 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator COLLINS of York The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-465) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-12 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-12 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-465) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-465) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-12 | Senate | READ ONCE Roll Call Number 275 Yeas 18 - Nays 15 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 286 (Yeas 74 - Nays 67 - Absent 9 - Excused 1) |
2017-06-09 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2017-05-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2017-05-16 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |