ME LD1600 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Investigate Perfluoroalkyl and Polyfluoroalkyl Substance Contamination of Land and Groundwater

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Investigate Perfluoroalkyl and Polyfluoroalkyl Substance Contamination of Land and Groundwater

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-02SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2021-07-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-07-02HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2021-07-02HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-07-02HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-494) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-386) thereto.
2021-07-02SenateSent down for concurrence
2021-07-02SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-494) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-386) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2021-07-02SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-494) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-386) thereto ADOPTED
2021-07-02SenateOn further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-386) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-494) READ and ADOPTED
2021-07-02SenateUnder further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-494) was ADOPTED
2021-07-02SenateUnder suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-494) in concurrence
2021-07-02SenateOn Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2021-06-14SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2021-06-14HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-14HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2021-06-10SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2021-06-10SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-494), in concurrence.
2021-06-10SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-494) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2021-06-10SenateREAD ONCE.
2021-06-10SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2021-06-09HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-09HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-494).
2021-06-09HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2021-06-09HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2021-06-08JointReported Out: OTP-AM
2021-05-12JointVoted: OTP-AM
2021-05-12JointWork Session Held
2021-04-28SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence
2021-04-28HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-04-28HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES.
2021-04-28HouseCommittee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback