ME LD1597 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide a Sales Tax Exemption for Purchases Made by Nonprofit Youth Camps
Title
An Act To Provide a Sales Tax Exemption for Purchases Made by Nonprofit Youth Camps
Sponsors
Rep. Heidi Sampson [R] | Rep. Josanne Dolloff [R] | Rep. Gary Drinkwater [R] | Rep. Steven Foster [R] |
Rep. Jeffery Hanley [R] | Rep. Andrew McLean [D] | Rep. Dwayne Prescott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-04 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-381) in concurrence |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-381) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-03 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-05-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-30 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-381). |
2019-05-30 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-05-30 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-381) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-30 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-05-30 | House | On motion of Representative TIPPING of Orono, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-30 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence |
2019-04-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-18 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |