ME LD159 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit the Mining of Massive Sulfide Ore Deposits on State Lands
Title
An Act To Prohibit the Mining of Massive Sulfide Ore Deposits on State Lands
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-06-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-06-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-21 | House | On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-21 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | On motion by Senator Davis of Piscataquis, REFERRED to the Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry, in concurrence. |
2017-01-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-26 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2017-01-26 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-01-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-01-19 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-01-19 | House | On motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, TABLED pending REFERENCE. |
2017-01-19 | House | Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=159&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0117&item=1&snum=128 |