ME LD1589 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Secretary of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Secretary of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Ensure Notification to the Public of the Location in Maine of Persons Convicted in Foreign Countries of Certain Crimes
Title
Resolve, To Ensure Notification to the Public of the Location in Maine of Persons Convicted in Foreign Countries of Certain Crimes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #561 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - Final Passage RC #528 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - Final Passage RC #528 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Senate | Secretary of the Senate |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Darek M. Grant |
2014-03-26 | Senate | ____________________ |
2014-03-26 | Senate | LD 1589In Senate, March 26, 2014, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 35 in the Affirmative and 0 in the Negative, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2014-03-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-25 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 561V 143 having voted in the affirmative and 0 in the negative, with 8 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2014-03-25 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2014-03-12 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2014-03-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-11 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 528 (Yeas 139 - Nays 0 - Absent 12 - Excused 0) |
2014-03-11 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-600) As Amended By House Amendment "A" (H-619) thereto , in concurrence. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-600) As Amended By House Amendment "A" (H-619) thereto ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | House Amendment "A" (H-619) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-600) READ and ADOPTED |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-600) READ |
2014-03-04 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2014-03-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator DUTREMBLE of York Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-02-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator GERZOFSKY of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reports READ |
2014-02-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-02-26 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-600) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-619) thereto. |
2014-02-26 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-600) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-619) thereto ADOPTED. |
2014-02-26 | House | On motion of Representative MAKER of Calais, House Amendment "A" (H-619) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-600) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-02-26 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-600) was READ. |
2014-02-26 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2014-02-26 | House | Subsequently, On motion of Representative DION of Portland, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2014-02-26 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2014-02-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-02-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-02-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-02-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-02-13 | House | Later today assigned. |
2014-02-13 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2014-02-13 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-12-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2013-12-30 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 23, 2013. |