ME LD1578 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase Health Security by Expanding Federally Funded Health Care for Maine People
Title
An Act To Increase Health Security by Expanding Federally Funded Health Care for Maine People
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #776 (Y: 94 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-04-17 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #606 (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - Enactment RC #745 (Y: 94 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - Adopt Hah-849 To Cah-704 RC #736 (Y: 95 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #735 (Y: 95 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #606 (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - Enactment RC #745 (Y: 94 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - Adopt Hah-849 To Cah-704 RC #736 (Y: 95 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #735 (Y: 95 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | House | (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.) |
2014-05-01 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 776V 94 having voted in the affirmative and 53 in the negative, with 4 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become law and the veto was sustained. |
2014-05-01 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2014-04-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 745 (Yeas 94 - Nays 51 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2014-04-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-704) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-849) thereto , in concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-704) As Amended By House Amendment "A" (H-849) ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | House Amendment "A" (H-849) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-704) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-704) READ |
2014-04-17 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 606 19 Yeas - 14 Nays- 0 Excused - 2 Absent PREVAILED |
2014-04-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator CRAVEN of Androscoggin Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-704) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-849) thereto. |
2014-04-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2014-04-17 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-704) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-849) thereto ADOPTED. |
2014-04-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 736 (Yeas 95 - Nays 52 - Absent 4 - Excused 0) |
2014-04-17 | House | On motion of Representative EVES of North Berwick, House Amendment "A" (H-849) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-704) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-04-17 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-704) was READ. |
2014-04-17 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2014-04-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 735 (Yeas 95 - Nays 52 - Absent 4 - Excused 0) |
2014-04-17 | House | Subsequently, On motion of Representative FARNSWORTH of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2014-04-17 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2014-04-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-10 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-01 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-31 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-27 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-26 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-24 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-21 | House | Later today assigned. |
2014-03-21 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2014-03-21 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-12-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2013-12-30 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 23, 2013. |