ME LD1577 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase the Availability of Mental Health Services
Title
An Act To Increase the Availability of Mental Health Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-b Rpt RC #608 (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-05 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #560 (Y: 81 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #560 (Y: 81 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2016-04-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence |
2016-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-636) in concurrence |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-636) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-04-06 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2016-04-06 | Senate | The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 608 Yeas 17 - Nays 18 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass As Amended In NON-CONCURRENCE FAILED |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reports READ |
2016-04-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-636). |
2016-04-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2016-04-05 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-636) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2016-04-05 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2016-04-05 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 560 (Yeas 81 - Nays 66 - Absent 4 - Excused 0) |
2016-04-05 | House | On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2016-04-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator Mason of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on Health and Human Services, in concurrence. |
2016-01-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-01-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2016-01-28 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |