ME LD1573 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 14 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Implement the Recommendations of the Commission To Study Long-term Care Workforce Issues

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Implement the Recommendations of the Commission To Study Long-term Care Workforce Issues

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-19SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302
2021-06-15SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2021-06-15HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-15HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2021-06-15HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2021-06-14SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2021-06-14SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-563), in concurrence.
2021-06-14SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-563) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2021-06-14SenateREAD ONCE.
2021-06-14SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2021-06-14HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-14HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-563).
2021-06-14HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2021-06-14HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2021-06-10JointReported Out: OTP-AM
2021-05-05JointVoted: OTP-AM
2021-05-05JointWork Session Held
2021-04-23HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2021-04-23HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on April 23, 2021.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback