ME LD1570 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Reduce Energy Prices for Maine Consumers
Title
An Act To Reduce Energy Prices for Maine Consumers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-16 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2011-06-16 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-16 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-06-15 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-15 | (H) The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-272) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-310) thereto | |
2011-06-15 | (S) Taken from the table by the President On motion by Senator THIBODEAU of Waldo Rules suspended The Senate RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-272) Under further suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED adoption of Committee Amendment "A" (S-272) (Remarks Made) On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-310) To Committee Amendment "A" (S-272) READ and ADOPTED Committee Amendment "A" (S-272) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-310) thereto adopted PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-272) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-310) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-06-14 | (S) Rules suspended The Senate RECONSIDERED ENACTMENT On motion by Same Senator Tabled Later Today Assigned pending enactment Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-14 | (S) On motion by Senator THIBODEAU of Waldo | |
2011-06-14 | (S) RECALLED From Governor's Desk pursuant to Joint Order SP 518 | |
2011-06-14 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules | |
2011-06-09 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-08 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-06-07 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-07 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-272) | |
2011-06-07 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-06-07 | (H) Under suspension of the rules | |
2011-06-07 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-06-07 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-272) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-06-07 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Report READ and ACCEPTED READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (S-272) READ and ADOPTED | |
2011-05-12 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-12 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. | |
2011-05-12 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-05-12 | (S) On motion by Senator Thibodeau of Waldo REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY | |
2011-05-12 | (S) suggested and ordered printed | |
2011-05-12 | (S) Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY |