ME LD1564 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Conform State Law to Federal Law While Promoting Safe Working Environments for Minors
Title
An Act To Conform State Law to Federal Law While Promoting Safe Working Environments for Minors
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Langley [R] | Rep. Kenneth Fredette [R] | Rep. Susan Austin [R] | Sen. Bradlee Farrin [R] |
Rep. Karen Gerrish [R] | Rep. Wayne Parry [R] | Rep. Joel Stetkis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-23 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2017-06-22 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-22 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-251) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-279) . |
2017-06-22 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-22 | House | Senate Amendment "A" (S-279) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-22 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-251) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-22 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-22 | House | On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-22 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-251) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-279) |
2017-06-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland Senate Amendment "A" (S-279) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-251) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-20 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Subsequently The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-13 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Senator VOLK of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-05-02 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |