ME LD1563 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Regulate the Licensing and Oversight of Professional Investigators
Title
An Act To Regulate the Licensing and Oversight of Professional Investigators
Sponsors
Sen. David C. Burns [R] | Sen. Stanley Gerzofsky [D] | Sen. Anne Haskell [D] | Sen. Roger Katz [R] |
Rep. Michel Lajoie [D] | Sen. Gary Plummer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2011-06-10 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-10 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-06-09 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-585) in concurrence | |
2011-06-09 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (H-585) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-08 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-585) | |
2011-06-08 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-06-08 | (H) Under suspension of the rules | |
2011-06-08 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-05-11 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Mason of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-05-11 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-11 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. | |
2011-05-11 | (H) Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |