ME LD1561 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Reauthorize Certain Land for Maine's Future Bonds and To Facilitate the Issuance of Those Bonds
Title
An Act To Reauthorize Certain Land for Maine's Future Bonds and To Facilitate the Issuance of Those Bonds
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Katz [R] | Rep. Gay Grant [D] | Sen. Catherine Breen [D] | Rep. Scott Cyrway [R] |
Sen. William Diamond [D] | Rep. Donna Doore [D] | Rep. Lori Fowle [D] | Rep. Martin Grohman [D] |
Rep. William Tuell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2016-04-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-01-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2016-01-14 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1561&snum=127 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0612&item=1&snum=127 |