ME LD156 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Implement the National Popular Vote for President

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Implement the National Popular Vote for President

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-04 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #56 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Acc Min Ought To Pass Rep RC #22 (Y: 66 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-04SenatePlaced in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2017-04-04SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 56 Yeas 21 - Nays 14 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
2017-04-04SenateOn motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report READ and ACCEPTED. in concurrence
2017-04-04SenateReports Read
2017-03-30HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-03-30HouseSubsequently, On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2017-03-30HouseROLL CALL NO. 22 (Yeas 66 - Nays 73 - Absent 11 - Excused 1)
2017-03-30HouseMotion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass Report FAILED.
2017-03-30HouseReports READ.
2017-01-26SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
2017-01-19HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-01-19HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
2017-01-19HouseCommittee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback