ME LD1559 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - 35 Yeas - 0 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - 35 Yeas - 0 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Reduce Energy Costs, Increase Energy Efficiency, Promote Electric System Reliability and Protect the Environment
Title
An Act To Reduce Energy Costs, Increase Energy Efficiency, Promote Electric System Reliability and Protect the Environment
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #352 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #397 (Y: 121 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Pass To Be Engrossed As Amend RC #173 (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Indef Post Sbs-223 RC #172 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Indef Post Sas-222 RC #171 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #397 (Y: 121 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Pass To Be Engrossed As Amend RC #173 (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Indef Post Sbs-223 RC #172 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Indef Post Sas-222 RC #171 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | Senate | 35 Yeas - 0 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Roll Call # 352 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Secretary of the Senate |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Darek M. Grant |
2013-06-26 | Senate | ____________________ |
2013-06-26 | Senate | EnactedIn Senate, June 7, 2013, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 35 in the affirmative and none in the negative, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2013-06-26 | House | RELEASED. |
2013-06-20 | House | HELD at the Request of Representative RUSSELL of Portland. |
2013-06-20 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 397V 121 having voted in the affirmative and 11 in the negative, with 19 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2013-06-20 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2013-06-07 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2013-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-07 | House | Subsequently, Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, WITHDREW his REQUEST for a Roll Call. |
2013-06-07 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-06-07 | House | Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-06-06 | Senate | (28 -Yeas, 7 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Roll Call Number 173 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-350) , in concurrence. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-06 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-06-06 | Senate | (20 -Yeas, 15 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Roll Call Number 172 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator CLEVELAND of Androscoggin Senate Amendment "B" (S-223) INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator YOUNGBLOOD of Penobscot Senate Amendment "B" (S-223) READ. (Remarks Made) |
2013-06-06 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-06-06 | Senate | (20 -Yeas, 15 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Roll Call Number 171 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook Senate Amendment "A" (S-222) INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator YOUNGBLOOD of Penobscot Senate Amendment "A" (S-222) READ. (Remarks Made) |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending Suspension of the Rules for Second Reading. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | House Amendment "A" (H-350) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-350). |
2013-06-05 | House | On motion of Representative FREDETTE of Newport, House Amendment "A" (H-350) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-06-05 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-06-05 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-05 | House | Reported by Representative HOBBINS, Representative FREDETTE and Senator CLEVELAND for the Joint Standing Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology pursuant to Joint Order H.P. 1125. |