ME LD1557 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Increase and Enhance School Safety by Allowing Individuals with Concealed Carry Permits to Possess Handguns on School Property
Title
An Act to Increase and Enhance School Safety by Allowing Individuals with Concealed Carry Permits to Possess Handguns on School Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-12 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #266 (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #143 (Y: 78 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #143 (Y: 78 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 266 Yeas 23 - Nays 10 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2023-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Reports Read |
2023-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-08 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 143 (Yeas 78 - Nays 62 - Absent 10 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2023-06-08 | House | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-08 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-05 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP |
2023-05-24 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-24 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-12 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2023-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2023-04-11 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |