ME LD1557 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-15 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-15 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish Ranked-choice Voting
Title
An Act To Establish Ranked-choice Voting
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-01-19 - House - Indef Postpone Bill & Papers RC #469 (Y: 78 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2016-03-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED in concurrence |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-01-26 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-01-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending CONSIDERATION |
2016-01-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-01-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 469 (Yeas 78 - Nays 67 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2016-01-19 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan the Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. |
2016-01-19 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2016-01-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-01-14 | House | Later today assigned. |
2016-01-14 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, TABLED pending REFERENCE. |
2016-01-14 | House | Transmitted to the Clerk of the 127th Maine Legislature by the Secretary of State on January 12, 2016 and ordered printed. |