ME LD1553 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Mitigate So-called Forever Chemicals in Decommissioned Schools by Establishing a Fund for Mitigation Projects
Title
An Act to Mitigate So-called Forever Chemicals in Decommissioned Schools by Establishing a Fund for Mitigation Projects
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Brakey [R] | Sen. Richard Bennett [R] | Rep. Adam Lee [D] | Rep. Laurel Libby [R] |
Rep. Kathleen Shaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-05-11 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2023-05-04 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-05-04 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1553&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0617&item=1&snum=131 |