ME LD155 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 28 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 232 Yeas 19 - Nays 15 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve, Directing the Board of Pesticides Control To Prohibit the Use of Certain Neonicotinoids for Outdoor Residential Use

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve, Directing the Board of Pesticides Control To Prohibit the Use of Certain Neonicotinoids for Outdoor Residential Use

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - Senate - Final Passage RC #232 (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'b' Otp-a RC #146 (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Table Until Later RC #145 (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-a RC #144 (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-28 - House - Acc Report 'b' Otp As Amend RC #38 (Y: 92 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 232 Yeas 19 - Nays 15 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2021-06-07SenateSubsequently FINALLY PASSED
2021-06-07SenateTaken from the table by the President
2021-06-03SenateUnfinished Business
2021-06-03SenateOn motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FINAL PASSAGE in concurrence Roll Call Ordered
2021-06-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-02HouseFINALLY PASSED.
2021-05-19SenateRELEASED.
2021-04-28SenateHELD at the Request of Senator STEWART of Aroostook.
2021-04-28SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "B" (H-67) in concurrence
2021-04-28SenateCommittee Amendment "B" (H-67) READ and ADOPTED
2021-04-28SenateREAD ONCE
2021-04-28SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 146 Yeas 27 - Nays 7 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2021-04-28SenateThe Report B Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-67) Report ACCEPTED
2021-04-28SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 145 Yeas 17 - Nays 17 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2021-04-28SenateOn motion by Senator TIMBERLAKE of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the Report B FAILED
2021-04-28SenateOn motion by Same Senator The Report B Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-67)
2021-04-28SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 144 Yeas 17 - Nays 17 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2021-04-28SenateOn motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot the Report A Ought to Pass as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-66) Report ACCEPTED. Report FAILED
2021-04-28SenateReports Read
2021-04-28HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-04-28HouseThe Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-67).
2021-04-28HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2021-04-28HouseCommittee Amendment "B" (H-67) was READ and ADOPTED.
2021-04-28HouseThe Resolve was READ ONCE.
2021-04-28HouseROLL CALL NO. 38 (Yeas 92 - Nays 53 - Absent 6 - Excused 0)
2021-04-28HouseOn motion of Representative O'NEIL of Saco, REPORT B Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2021-04-28HouseReports READ.
2021-04-05JointReported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM/ONTP
2021-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-03-09JointVoted: Divided Report
2021-03-09JointWork Session Held
2021-03-02JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-01-19HouseThe Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2021-01-19HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on January 19, 2021.

Subjects


Maine State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=155&snum=130
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0111&item=1&snum=130
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0111&item=5&snum=130
Amendmenthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0111&item=3&snum=130
Supplementhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN015503.pdf
Supplementhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN015505.pdf
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280078133&chamber=House&serialnumber=38
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280078133&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=144
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280078133&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=145
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280078133&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=146
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280078133&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=232

Bill Comments

feedback