ME LD1549 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-23 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-23 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Name the Main Street Bridge in Newport after Sergeant Donald Sidney Skidgel
Title
Resolve, To Name the Main Street Bridge in Newport after Sergeant Donald Sidney Skidgel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-23 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED in concurrence | |
2011-05-23 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-23 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2011-05-19 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence | |
2011-05-19 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-18 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2011-05-18 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2011-05-18 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2011-05-17 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-17 | (H) The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED | |
2011-05-17 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-05-17 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-05-16 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Collins of York, REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |