ME LD1546 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Clarify the Language Defining Schedule W Drugs and To Add Drugs to the List of Schedule W Drugs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Clarify the Language Defining Schedule W Drugs and To Add Drugs to the List of Schedule W Drugs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-19SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2017-06-16HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-16HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-06-15HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-15HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-262).
2017-06-15HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2017-06-15HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-262) was READ and ADOPTED.
2017-06-15HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2017-06-15HouseOn motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2017-06-15HouseReports READ.
2017-06-14SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-06-14SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-262)
2017-06-14SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-262) READ and ADOPTED
2017-06-14SenateREAD ONCE
2017-06-14SenateOn motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
2017-06-14SenateReports Read
2017-04-27HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-04-27HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
2017-04-27SenateCommittee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback