ME LD1544 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - (S) Taken from the table by the President On motion by Senator COLLINS of York Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED in concurrence Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - (S) Taken from the table by the President On motion by Senator COLLINS of York Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED in concurrence Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Promote Rail Competition in Northern Maine
Title
An Act To Promote Rail Competition in Northern Maine
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Cebra [R] | Sen. Ronald Collins [R] | Rep. Stacey Fitts [R] | Sen. Edward Mazurek [D] |
Rep. Ann Peoples [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | (S) Taken from the table by the President On motion by Senator COLLINS of York Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED in concurrence Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | |
2011-06-10 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York Tabled Later Today Assigned pending reference Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-10 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-10 | (H) On motion of Representative FITTS of Pittsfield the Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. | |
2011-06-10 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2011-06-09 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-08 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-07 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-06 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-03 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-02 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-01 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-31 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-26 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-25 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-24 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-23 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-18 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-17 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-16 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-12 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-11 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-10 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) On motion of Representative CEBRA of Naples, TABLED pending REFERENCE. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Committee on TRANSPORTATION suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1544&snum=125 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1133&item=1&snum=125 |