ME LD1534 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Implement the Recommendations of the Interagency Task Force on Invasive Aquatic Plants and Nuisance Species
Title
An Act to Implement the Recommendations of the Interagency Task Force on Invasive Aquatic Plants and Nuisance Species
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-30 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-05-22 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2023-05-15 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-05-15 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-05 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE in concurrence |
2023-04-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1534&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0989&item=1&snum=131 |