ME LD1531 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Maintain Access to Safe Medical Marijuana
Title
An Act To Maintain Access to Safe Medical Marijuana
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2013-06-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-13 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-13 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-271). |
2013-06-13 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-06-13 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-271) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-13 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-06-13 | House | On motion of Representative DILL of Old Town, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-13 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-271).. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-271) READ and ADOPTED . |
2013-06-12 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-05-15 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-15 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator Jackson of Aroostook REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed |