ME LD153 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Strengthen Testing for Lead in School Drinking Water
Title
An Act To Strengthen Testing for Lead in School Drinking Water
Sponsors
Rep. Rebecca Millett [D] | Sen. Catherine Breen [D] | Sen. Ned Claxton [D] | Rep. Margaret Craven [D] |
Rep. Patricia Hymanson [D] | Rep. Colleen Madigan [D] | Sen. Linda Sanborn [D] | Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-08 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-08 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-84). |
2019-05-08 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-05-08 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-84) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-08 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-05-08 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-08 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-84) |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-84) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-05-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-84) Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-01-17 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-17 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |