ME LD1521 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Strengthen Protections against Civil Asset Forfeiture
Title
An Act To Strengthen Protections against Civil Asset Forfeiture
Sponsors
Rep. William Faulkingham [R] | Rep. John Andrews [R] | Rep. Justin Fecteau [R] | Rep. Laurel Libby [R] |
Sen. Chloe Maxmin [D] | Sen. David Miramant [D] | Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] | Rep. Charlotte Warren [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-17 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #452 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #354 (Y: 11 N: 129 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2021-06-16 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #354 (Y: 11 N: 129 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-711) in concurrence |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-711) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-18 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 452 Yeas 33 - Nays 0 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRENNER of Cumberland The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2021-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-711). |
2021-06-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-17 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-711) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-17 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 354 (Yeas 11 - Nays 129 - Absent 11 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-17 | House | Motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report FAILED. |
2021-06-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-16 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-05-18 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-18 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-28 | Senate | REFERENCED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2021-04-28 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-04-28 | House | Representative WARREN from the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Reports a recommendation for a CHANGE OF COMMITEE. |
2021-04-28 | House | Report of the Chair-Pursuant to Joint Order S.P. 9 |
2021-04-23 | Joint | Reported Out: REFER TO OTHER |
2021-04-23 | Joint | Refer Approved by Chairs/Leads: REFER TO OTHER |
2021-04-15 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-04-15 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on April 15, 2021. |