ME LD1521 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - LD 1521 In Senate, April 29, 2016, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 In Favor and 0 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - LD 1521 In Senate, April 29, 2016, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 In Favor and 0 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create Equity among Essential Nonprofit Health Care Providers in Relation to the Sales Tax and the Service Provider Tax
Title
An Act To Create Equity among Essential Nonprofit Health Care Providers in Relation to the Sales Tax and the Service Provider Tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-29 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #721 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #668 (Y: 139 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #668 (Y: 139 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | LD 1521 In Senate, April 29, 2016, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 In Favor and 0 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2016-04-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-29 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 668V 139 having voted in the affirmative and 10 in the negative, with 2 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2016-04-29 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2016-04-13 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2016-03-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence |
2016-03-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-08 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-521), in concurrence. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-521) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2016-03-01 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2016-02-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-02-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-521). |
2016-02-25 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2016-02-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2016-01-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator McCormick of Kennebec, REFERRED to the Committee on Taxation, in concurrence. |
2016-01-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-01-06 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2016-01-06 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |